MT HB94 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-20 - (H) Veto Override Failed in Legislature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Generally revise public safety officer standards/training council laws

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Generally revise public safety officer standards/training council laws

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-20 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate (Y: 60 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-20House(H) Veto Override Failed in Legislature
2017-05-17House(H) Veto Override Vote Mail Poll in Progress
2017-05-12House(H) Veto Override Vote Mail Poll Letter Being Prepared
2017-05-11House(H) Vetoed by Governor
2017-05-02House(H) Transmitted to Governor
2017-04-28Senate(S) Signed by President
2017-04-27House(H) Signed by Speaker
2017-04-24House(H) Returned from Enrolling
2017-04-22 (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available
2017-04-20House(H) Sent to Enrolling
2017-04-20House(H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate
2017-04-20House(H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2017-04-19House(H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred
2017-04-19House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2017-04-07Senate(S) Returned to House with Amendments
2017-04-06Senate(S) 3rd Reading Concurred
2017-04-06Senate(S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2017-04-05Senate(S) 2nd Reading Concurred
2017-04-05Senate(S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2017-04-05 (C) Printed - New Version Available
2017-03-29 (C) Printed - New Version Available
2017-03-29Senate(S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Judiciary
2017-03-28Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Judiciary
2017-03-14Senate(S) Hearing (S) Judiciary
2017-02-23Senate(S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary
2017-02-23Senate(S) First Reading
2017-02-22House(H) Transmitted to Senate
2017-02-22House(H) 3rd Reading Passed
2017-02-22House(H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2017-02-21House(H) 2nd Reading Passed
2017-02-21House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2017-02-17 (C) Printed - New Version Available
2017-02-17House(H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Judiciary
2017-02-17House(H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Judiciary
2017-01-10House(H) Hearing (H) Judiciary
2017-01-04House(H) Fiscal Note Printed
2017-01-03House(H) Fiscal Note Signed
2017-01-02House(H) First Reading (H) Judiciary
2016-12-28House(H) Fiscal Note Received
2016-12-27House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary
2016-12-14House(H) Fiscal Note Requested
2016-12-14 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2016-12-14House(H) Introduced
2016-12-09 (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
2016-12-08 (C) Draft in Assembly
2016-12-08 (C) Executive Director Review
2016-12-08 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2016-12-08 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2016-12-05 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2016-12-02 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
2016-11-30 (C) Draft in Edit
2016-11-28 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2016-11-28 (C) Fiscal Note Probable
2016-11-22 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2016-07-06 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=94&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20171
Texthttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2017/hb0099/HB0094_1.pdf
Texthttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2017/hb0099/HB0094_2.pdf
Texthttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2017/hb0099/HB0094_3.pdf
Texthttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2017/hb0099/HB0094_x.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2017/minutes/house/votesheets/HB0094JUH170217.pdf
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H621&P_SESS=20171
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H659&P_SESS=20171
Roll Callhttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2017/minutes/senate/votesheets/HB0094JUS170328.pdf
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S1337&P_SESS=20171
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S1393&P_SESS=20171
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H1675&P_SESS=20171
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H1761&P_SESS=20171

Bill Comments

feedback