MT HB9 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Cultural and aesthetic grants
Title
Cultural and aesthetic grants
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Woods [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-12 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 79 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 79 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2017-05-08 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2017-04-28 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-28 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2017-04-26 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-20 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-04-19 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-04-18 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-04-13 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2017-04-12 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-12 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-04-11 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-11 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-04-10 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-04-10 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-04-06 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-04-01 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-03-31 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-03-30 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2017-03-30 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-03-30 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-03-29 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-03-29 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-03-21 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2017-03-21 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2017-03-20 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2017-02-09 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2017-02-09 | House | (H) Scheduled for Executive Action (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Long-Range Planning |
2017-02-01 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Long-Range Planning |
2017-01-02 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Appropriations |
2016-12-27 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2016-12-12 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2016-12-12 | House | (H) Introduced |
2016-12-07 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2016-12-07 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2016-12-06 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2016-12-06 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2016-12-06 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2016-12-01 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2016-12-01 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2016-11-29 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2016-11-28 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2016-11-17 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-08-30 | (C) Draft Request Received |