MT HB9 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Cultural and Aesthetic Grants
Title
Cultural and Aesthetic Grants
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Cuffe [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate (Y: 79 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-18 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 78 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 73 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-18 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 78 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 73 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2015-05-05 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2015-04-25 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2015-04-25 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-04-24 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-23 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-04-23 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-04-22 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-04-22 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate |
2015-04-22 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-21 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred |
2015-04-21 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-18 | Senate | (S) Returned to House with Amendments |
2015-04-18 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-18 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-17 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-17 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-15 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-04-15 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-04-15 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-04-08 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-03-30 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-03-30 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-03-28 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2015-03-27 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-03-27 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-03-26 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-03-26 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-25 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2015-03-25 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2015-02-19 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2015-02-16 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2015-02-16 | House | (H) Scheduled for Executive Action (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Long-Range Planning |
2015-02-06 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Long-Range Planning |
2015-02-04 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Long-Range Planning |
2015-02-04 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Appropriations |
2015-01-05 | House | (H) First Reading |
2014-12-23 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2014-12-12 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2014-12-12 | House | (H) Introduced |
2014-12-04 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2014-12-04 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2014-12-04 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2014-11-24 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2014-11-24 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2014-11-24 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2014-11-21 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2014-11-21 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-06-17 | (C) Draft Request Received |