MT HB87 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminate the requirement for a third official school enrollment count
Title
Eliminate the requirement for a third official school enrollment count
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - (S) Education and Cultural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-07 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 75 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - (S) Education and Cultural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-07 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 75 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2015-04-01 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2015-03-24 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2015-03-24 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-03-23 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-20 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-03-20 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-03-18 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-03-17 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2015-03-17 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2015-03-17 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-03-16 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2015-03-16 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-12 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-03-12 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-03-12 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-03-09 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-02-21 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2015-02-20 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2015-02-18 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2015-02-10 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2015-02-10 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-02-09 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2015-02-07 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-02-07 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-02-06 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2015-02-05 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2015-02-05 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2015-01-26 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2015-01-26 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-01-26 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-01-24 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Pass Consideration |
2015-01-24 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-01-22 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Education |
2015-01-21 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Education |
2015-01-19 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Education |
2015-01-15 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Education |
2015-01-07 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed (H) Education |
2015-01-06 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed (H) Education |
2015-01-05 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received (H) Education |
2015-01-05 | House | (H) First Reading |
2014-12-23 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Education |
2014-12-15 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2014-12-12 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2014-12-12 | House | (H) Introduced |
2014-11-10 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2014-10-31 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2014-10-31 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2014-10-29 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2014-10-27 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2014-10-27 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2014-10-27 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2014-10-24 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2014-09-30 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-06-25 | (C) Draft Request Received |