MT HB8 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Renewable Resource Bonds & Loans
Title
Renewable Resource Bonds & Loans
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Keane [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-23 - House - (H) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 3rd Reading Process (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-23 - House - (H) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 3rd Reading Process (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2019-05-07 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2019-05-01 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-30 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2019-04-26 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-26 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2019-04-25 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2019-04-25 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2019-04-25 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate |
2019-04-25 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-24 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred |
2019-04-24 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-23 | House | (H) On Motion Rules Suspended |
2019-04-18 | Senate | (S) Returned to House with Amendments |
2019-04-18 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-18 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-18 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-18 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-04-18 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-17 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2019-04-16 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2019-04-16 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-04-15 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-15 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-13 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-04-12 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-04-12 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-04-05 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-04-02 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-04-02 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-04-01 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2019-04-01 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-04-01 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-03-25 | House | (H) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 3rd Reading Process |
2019-03-25 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Failed |
2019-03-25 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-03-23 | House | (H) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 3rd Reading Process |
2019-03-23 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Failed |
2019-03-23 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-03-22 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-03-22 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Pass Consideration |
2019-03-22 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-02-18 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-02-18 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2019-02-15 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2019-01-29 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2019-01-17 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2019-01-17 | House | (H) Scheduled for Executive Action (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Long-Range Planning |
2019-01-16 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Long-Range Planning |
2019-01-09 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-01-08 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2019-01-07 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Appropriations |
2019-01-07 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2018-12-19 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2018-12-17 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2018-12-14 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2018-12-14 | House | (H) Introduced |
2018-12-05 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2018-12-05 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2018-12-05 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2018-12-04 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2018-12-04 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2018-12-03 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2018-12-03 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2018-11-30 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2018-11-29 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2018-11-29 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-08-24 | (C) Draft Request Received |