MT HB667 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-11 - (H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-11 - (H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise education laws related to children under 5 years of age
Title
Generally revise education laws related to children under 5 years of age
Sponsors
Rep. David Bedey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-11 | House | (H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2023-02-27 | House | (H) Bill Withdrawn per House Rule H30-50(3)(b) |
2023-02-24 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-02-24 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2023-02-24 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2023-02-21 | House | (H) First Reading |
2023-02-21 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Education |
2023-02-20 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2023-02-20 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-02-20 | House | (H) Introduced |
2023-02-20 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2023-02-20 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2023-01-23 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-01-20 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-01-20 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-01-20 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-01-20 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-01-19 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-01-19 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-01-19 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-01-18 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2023-01-14 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2023-01-13 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2022-11-20 | (C) Draft Request Received |