MT HB648 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - (H) Signed by Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - (H) Signed by Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the best beginnings scholarship program
Title
Provide for the best beginnings scholarship program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-28 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 12 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - House - (H) Human Services Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 12 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - House - (H) Human Services Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2023-05-02 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2023-05-01 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2023-04-28 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2023-04-28 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2023-04-28 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-04-27 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2023-04-27 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-04-24 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-04-21 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-04-20 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-04-19 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-04-19 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2023-04-19 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2023-04-07 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2023-04-05 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-04-05 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Unsigned |
2023-04-05 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2023-04-05 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2023-04-04 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2023-04-04 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2023-04-04 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-04-04 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2023-04-03 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2023-04-03 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2023-04-03 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-03-31 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2023-03-31 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2023-03-31 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2023-03-28 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2023-03-27 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2023-03-27 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2023-03-22 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-03-22 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2023-03-22 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2023-03-20 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2023-03-20 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Human Services |
2023-03-20 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2023-03-17 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Human Services |
2023-03-17 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2023-03-14 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Human Services |
2023-02-28 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-02-27 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2023-02-27 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2023-02-21 | House | (H) First Reading |
2023-02-20 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Human Services |
2023-02-17 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2023-02-17 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-02-17 | House | (H) Introduced |
2023-02-17 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2023-02-15 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-02-15 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-02-15 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-02-15 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-02-15 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-02-15 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-02-15 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-02-15 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-02-15 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2023-02-14 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2023-02-14 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2023-02-14 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2023-02-14 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2023-02-07 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2023-02-07 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2022-12-03 | (C) Draft Request Received |