MT HB64 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Require Dept of Admin to adopt rules on loan of employees between agencies
Title
Require Dept of Admin to adopt rules on loan of employees between agencies
Sponsors
Rep. Wayne Stahl [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-18 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-12 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 67 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-12 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 67 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | (H) Died in Process | |
2011-04-01 | (H) Vetoed by Governor | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-03-23 | (S) Signed by President | |
2011-03-22 | (H) Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-21 | (H) Returned from Enrolling | |
2011-03-21 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Sent to Enrolling | |
2011-03-18 | (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-03-17 | (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred | |
2011-03-17 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-12 | (S) Returned to House with Amendments | |
2011-03-12 | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred | |
2011-03-12 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-03-10 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2011-03-10 | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended | |
2011-03-10 | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) State Administration | |
2011-03-07 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) State Administration | |
2011-03-07 | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration | |
2011-02-08 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration | |
2011-02-08 | (S) First Reading | |
2011-02-01 | (H) Transmitted to Senate | |
2011-02-01 | (H) 3rd Reading Passed | |
2011-02-01 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-01-31 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2011-01-31 | (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended | |
2011-01-31 | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) State Administration | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) State Administration | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration | |
2011-01-08 | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) State Administration | |
2011-01-03 | (H) First Reading | |
2010-12-20 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration | |
2010-12-10 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2010-12-10 | (H) Introduced | |
2010-11-23 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2010-11-22 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2010-11-22 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2010-11-19 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2010-11-19 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2010-11-18 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2010-11-12 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2010-11-06 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2010-08-26 | (C) Draft Request Received |