MT HB629 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise board of livestock laws
Title
Revise board of livestock laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-20 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-28 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - (H) Agriculture Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-28 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - (H) Agriculture Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2015-04-25 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2015-04-25 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-04-24 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-22 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-04-21 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-04-20 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-04-20 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2015-04-20 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-20 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-18 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-18 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-15 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2015-04-14 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2015-04-07 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2015-04-01 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2015-04-01 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-03-31 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2015-03-30 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-03-30 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-03-28 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-03-28 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-27 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Agriculture |
2015-03-26 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Agriculture |
2015-03-26 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Agriculture |
2015-03-24 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-03-24 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-03-24 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Agriculture |
2015-03-24 | House | (H) Introduced |
2015-03-24 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-03-24 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-03-23 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-03-23 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-03-23 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-03-23 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-03-23 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2015-03-23 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-03-23 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-01-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |