MT HB584 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-17 - (H) Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-17 - (H) Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revising retaliatory conduct laws related to landlords and tenants
Title
Revising retaliatory conduct laws related to landlords and tenants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-30 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-28 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 60 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 60 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-28 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 60 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 60 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-17 | House | (H) Vetoed by Governor |
2015-04-07 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2015-04-07 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-04-01 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-01 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-04-01 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-04-01 | (C) Clerical Corrections Made - New Version Available | |
2015-03-31 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-03-31 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2015-03-30 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2015-03-30 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-03-28 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2015-03-28 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-25 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Judiciary |
2015-03-25 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Judiciary |
2015-03-12 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2015-03-06 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2015-03-06 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-02-27 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2015-02-26 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-02-26 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-02-25 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-02-25 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-23 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-02-23 | (C) Sponsors Engrossed | |
2015-02-23 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Judiciary |
2015-02-23 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Judiciary |
2015-02-23 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2015-02-20 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-20 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-02-20 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2015-02-20 | House | (H) Introduced |
2015-02-18 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-02-18 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-02-18 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-02-18 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-02-18 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-02-18 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-18 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-02-18 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2015-02-18 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-02-17 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-02-17 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2014-12-16 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2014-11-10 | (C) Draft Request Received |