MT HB573 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revise education funding laws related to tax increment financing
Title
Revise education funding laws related to tax increment financing
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Cook [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Taxation |
2017-04-12 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Taxation |
2017-03-31 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation |
2017-03-24 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2017-03-24 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-03-23 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2017-03-23 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-03-23 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-03-22 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-03-22 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-03-20 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-03-20 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Taxation |
2017-03-20 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Taxation |
2017-03-14 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2017-03-08 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-03-07 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2017-03-07 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2017-03-01 | House | (H) First Reading |
2017-03-01 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2017-02-27 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-02-27 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-02-27 | House | (H) Introduced |
2017-02-27 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-02-24 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-02-24 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-02-24 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2017-02-24 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2017-02-24 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-02-24 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-02-24 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2017-02-24 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2017-02-23 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2017-02-23 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-02-23 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2017-02-23 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2017-02-23 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2016-12-21 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2016-12-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |