MT HB560 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-12 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-12 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increase public involvement in urban renewal areas
Title
Increase public involvement in urban renewal areas
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-12 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-12 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2011-05-12 | (H) Signed by Governor | |
2011-05-02 | (H) Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-29 | (S) Signed by President | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-13 | (H) Returned from Enrolling | |
2011-04-12 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Sent to Enrolling | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Returned to House | |
2011-04-12 | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-11 | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred | |
2011-04-11 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-04-07 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Local Government | |
2011-04-06 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Local Government | |
2011-04-06 | (S) Hearing (S) Local Government | |
2011-03-31 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Local Government | |
2011-03-31 | (S) First Reading | |
2011-03-28 | (H) Transmitted to Senate | |
2011-03-28 | (H) 3rd Reading Passed | |
2011-03-28 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-03-26 | (H) 2nd Reading Passed | |
2011-03-26 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-19 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Taxation | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Taxation | |
2011-03-15 | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation | |
2011-03-05 | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Taxation | |
2011-02-16 | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Taxation | |
2011-02-15 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Local Government | |
2011-02-15 | (H) First Reading | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Introduced | |
2011-02-14 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2011-02-14 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2011-02-14 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2011-02-14 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2011-02-14 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2011-02-14 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2011-02-11 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2011-02-10 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2011-02-10 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2010-12-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |