MT HB499 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - (H) Veto Override Failed in Legislature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - (H) Veto Override Failed in Legislature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amending conveyance exemptions for subdivision regulations
Title
Amending conveyance exemptions for subdivision regulations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-06 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-06 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-10 | House | (H) Veto Override Failed in Legislature |
2013-05-10 | House | (H) Veto Override Vote Mail Poll in Progress |
2013-05-03 | House | (H) Veto Override Vote Mail Poll Letter Being Prepared |
2013-05-03 | House | (H) Vetoed by Governor |
2013-04-25 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2013-04-25 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2013-04-19 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-18 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2013-04-18 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2013-04-17 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2013-04-17 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate |
2013-04-17 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-16 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred |
2013-04-16 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-08 | Senate | (S) Returned to House with Amendments |
2013-04-08 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-08 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-06 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-06 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-04 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-04-04 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Local Government |
2013-04-03 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Local Government |
2013-03-20 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Local Government |
2013-03-08 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Local Government |
2013-03-08 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-02-27 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2013-02-26 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-02-26 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-02-25 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-02-25 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-02-22 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-02-22 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Local Government |
2013-02-21 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Local Government |
2013-02-21 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Local Government |
2013-02-16 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-02-15 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-02-15 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Local Government |
2013-02-15 | House | (H) Introduced |
2013-02-12 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-02-11 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-02-11 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-02-11 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-02-11 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-02-09 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2013-02-08 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-02-08 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2013-02-01 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-01-31 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-01-31 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-01-31 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-31 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-01-31 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2013-01-29 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-01-22 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2013-01-05 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-12-03 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2012-11-08 | (C) Draft Request Received |