MT HB487 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Make Indian language education an allowable TANF work activity
Title
Make Indian language education an allowable TANF work activity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-23 - Senate - (S) Motion Failed (Y: 24 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-02 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - (H) Human Services Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - (H) Human Services Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2021-04-23 | Senate | (S) Motion Failed (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2021-03-29 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2021-03-26 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2021-03-08 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2021-03-08 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-03-02 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2021-03-02 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-03-02 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-03-01 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-03-01 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-02-27 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Human Services |
2021-02-26 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Human Services |
2021-02-25 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Human Services |
2021-02-19 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Human Services |
2021-02-18 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-18 | House | (H) Introduced |
2021-02-17 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-02-17 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-16 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-02-16 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-16 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-02-16 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-02-16 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-16 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-02-15 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-02-14 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-02-12 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-02-12 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2021-02-11 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-12-17 | (C) Draft Request Received |