MT HB485 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Establish reporting requirements for Medicaid/CHIP quality measures
Title
Establish reporting requirements for Medicaid/CHIP quality measures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Failed (Y: 44 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-01 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 53 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - (H) Human Services Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 53 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - (H) Human Services Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | (H) Died in Process |
2021-03-02 | House | (H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2021-03-02 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Failed |
2021-03-02 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-03-01 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-03-01 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-02-27 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Human Services |
2021-02-27 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2021-02-26 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Human Services |
2021-02-26 | House | (H) Taken from Table in Committee (H) Human Services |
2021-02-25 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Human Services |
2021-02-25 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-02-25 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Signed |
2021-02-25 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Received |
2021-02-25 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-02-25 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-02-24 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-02-24 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2021-02-24 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2021-02-23 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Human Services |
2021-02-18 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-18 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Human Services |
2021-02-18 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-02-18 | House | (H) Introduced |
2021-02-18 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-02-08 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-06 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-02-06 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-05 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-02-05 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-02-05 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-05 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-02-05 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-02-05 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-02-03 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-02-02 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2021-02-02 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-12-12 | (C) Draft Request Received |