MT HB464 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a hazardous materials spill response task force
Title
Create a hazardous materials spill response task force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2019-02-27 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2019-02-27 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Natural Resources |
2019-02-14 | House | (H) Sponsor List Modified |
2019-02-13 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-13 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Natural Resources |
2019-02-13 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2019-02-13 | House | (H) Introduced |
2019-02-11 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-02-08 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-02-07 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-07 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-02-07 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2019-02-05 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2019-02-05 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-02-04 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-02-04 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-02-04 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-02-04 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-04 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-02-01 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-02-01 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2019-02-01 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-01-31 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-01-24 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-01-22 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2019-01-02 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2018-12-28 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Appropriations
Emergency and Disaster Services
Fires and Fire Protection
Indians
Legislature
Local Government
Transportation
Emergency and Disaster Services
Fires and Fire Protection
Indians
Legislature
Local Government
Transportation
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=464&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20191 |
Text | https://leg.mt.gov/bills/2019/HB0499/HB0464_1.pdf |