MT HB450 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise assumption of criminal jurisdiction of Flathead Indian country laws
Title
Revise assumption of criminal jurisdiction of Flathead Indian country laws
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Hertz [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-24 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | House | (H) Died in Process |
2017-03-01 | House | (H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2017-02-25 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Not Passed |
2017-02-25 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-02-24 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Judiciary |
2017-02-24 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Judiciary |
2017-02-23 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-02-22 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2017-02-21 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2017-02-15 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-02-15 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2017-02-13 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-02-13 | House | (H) First Reading |
2017-02-13 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2017-02-13 | House | (H) Introduced |
2017-02-13 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-02-13 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-02-10 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-02-10 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-02-10 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-02-09 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-02-09 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2017-02-09 | (C) Draft Taken by Drafter | |
2017-02-06 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-02-06 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-02-06 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2017-02-06 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2017-02-06 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-02-06 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-02-04 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2017-02-04 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2017-02-03 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2017-02-02 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-02-02 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2017-01-30 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2017-01-28 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-11-27 | (C) Draft Request Received |