MT HB438 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Revise marriage dissolution laws by requiring counseling in certain instances

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise marriage dissolution laws by requiring counseling in certain instances

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-19 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Not Passed (Y: 40 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-28 (H) Died in Process
2011-02-24 (H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
2011-02-19 (H) 2nd Reading Not Passed
2011-02-19 (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2011-02-18 (H) 2nd Reading Pass Consideration
2011-02-18 (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2011-02-15 (C) Printed - New Version Available
2011-02-15 (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Judiciary
2011-02-15 (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Judiciary
2011-02-14 (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary
2011-02-07 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2011-02-07 (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary
2011-02-07 (H) First Reading
2011-02-07 (H) Introduced
2011-02-02 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2011-01-31 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2011-01-31 (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
2011-01-31 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2011-01-29 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2011-01-29 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2011-01-26 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2011-01-25 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2011-01-25 (C) Draft Back for Technical Correction
2011-01-20 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2011-01-17 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2011-01-17 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2010-12-29 (C) Draft On Hold
2010-12-21 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback