MT HB435 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-14 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Generally revise civil liability laws for government

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Generally revise civil liability laws for government

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-29 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - (S) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 3rd Reading Process (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Failed (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-14 Chapter Number Assigned
2021-05-14House(H) Signed by Governor
2021-05-04House(H) Transmitted to Governor
2021-05-04Senate(S) Signed by President
2021-05-04House(H) Signed by Speaker
2021-05-03 (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available
2021-05-03House(H) Returned from Enrolling
2021-04-29House(H) Sent to Enrolling
2021-04-29Senate(S) Returned to House
2021-04-29Senate(S) 3rd Reading Concurred
2021-04-29Senate(S) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 3rd Reading Process
2021-04-28Senate(S) 3rd Reading Failed
2021-04-28Senate(S) 2nd Reading Concurred
2021-04-28Senate(S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2021-03-22Senate(S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2021-03-22Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2021-03-19Senate(S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2021-03-08Senate(S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2021-03-01Senate(S) First Reading
2021-03-01House(H) Transmitted to Senate
2021-03-01House(H) 3rd Reading Passed
2021-03-01House(H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2021-02-26House(H) 2nd Reading Passed
2021-02-26House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2021-02-24House(H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Judiciary
2021-02-24House(H) Fiscal Note Printed
2021-02-24House(H) Fiscal Note Signed
2021-02-24House(H) Fiscal Note Received
2021-02-22House(H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Judiciary
2021-02-22House(H) Hearing (H) Judiciary
2021-02-17House(H) First Reading
2021-02-17House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary
2021-02-16 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2021-02-16House(H) Fiscal Note Requested
2021-02-16House(H) Introduced
2021-02-16 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2021-02-11 (C) Executive Director Final Review
2021-02-11 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2021-02-11 (C) Draft in Assembly
2021-02-10 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2021-02-10 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2021-02-09 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2021-02-02 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2021-02-02 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2021-01-29 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2021-01-29 (C) Executive Director Final Review
2021-01-29 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2021-01-29 (C) Draft in Assembly
2021-01-28 (C) Executive Director Review
2021-01-28 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2021-01-28 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2021-01-25 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2021-01-24 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
2021-01-21 (C) Draft in Edit
2021-01-20 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2021-01-18 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2021-01-16 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2021-01-14 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2021-01-12 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2021-01-08 (C) Draft Taken Off Hold
2020-11-25 (C) Draft On Hold
2020-11-22 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=435&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20211
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2021/HB0499/HB0435_1.pdf
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2021/HB0499/HB0435_X.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2021/FNPDF/HB0435_1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2021/minutes/house/votesheets/HB0435JUH210222.pdf
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H677&P_SESS=20211
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H741&P_SESS=20211
Roll Callhttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2021/minutes/senate/votesheets/HB0435BUS210322.pdf
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S2011&P_SESS=20211
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S2067&P_SESS=20211
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S2068&P_SESS=20211
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S2039&P_SESS=20211

Bill Comments 750

feedback