MT HB426 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise laws regarding interactions between DPHHS and child and family ombudsman
Title
Revise laws regarding interactions between DPHHS and child and family ombudsman
Sponsors
Sen. Dennis Lenz [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate (Y: 67 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 71 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - Senate - (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 76 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 71 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - Senate - (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 76 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2021-05-07 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2021-04-30 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-30 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2021-04-30 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-27 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2021-04-27 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2021-04-22 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2021-04-22 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-04-21 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred |
2021-04-21 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-04-08 | Senate | (S) Returned to House with Amendments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2021-04-08 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-04-07 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2021-04-07 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-03-31 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Pass Consideration |
2021-03-31 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-03-29 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2021-03-29 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2021-03-26 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2021-03-24 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2021-03-23 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-02-25 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2021-02-25 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-02-24 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2021-02-24 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-02-24 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-02-23 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-02-23 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Judiciary |
2021-02-19 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Judiciary |
2021-02-19 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2021-02-16 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2021-02-16 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-15 | House | (H) Introduced |
2021-02-11 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-02-08 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-08 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-02-08 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-08 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-02-08 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-02-08 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-08 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-02-05 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-02-05 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-02-03 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-02-03 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2021-01-29 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2021-01-27 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-10-01 | (C) Draft Request Received |