MT HB413 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee  
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee  
Summary
Use coal tax to fund energy efficiency in public education facilities
Title
Use coal tax to fund energy efficiency in public education facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-28 | (H) Died in Standing Committee   | |
2009-03-31 | (H) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal   | |
2009-03-25 | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Appropriations | |
2009-03-19 | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations | |
2009-03-17 | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations | |
2009-03-17 | (H) 2nd Reading Passed   | |
2009-03-17 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-03-12 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Taxation | |
2009-03-11 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Taxation | |
2009-02-12 | (H) Fiscal Note Printed   | |
2009-02-10 | (H) Fiscal Note Received   | |
2009-02-10 | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation | |
2009-01-31 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically   | |
2009-01-31 | (H) First Reading   | |
2009-01-31 | (H) Fiscal Note Requested   | |
2009-01-31 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation | |
2009-01-31 | (H) Introduced   | |
2009-01-29 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester   | |
2009-01-27 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery   | |
2009-01-27 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review   | |
2009-01-26 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review   | |
2009-01-26 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically   | |
2009-01-26 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing   | |
2009-01-26 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]   | |
2009-01-26 | (C) Draft in Edit   | |
2009-01-26 | (C) Draft in Legal Review   | |
2009-01-21 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review   | |
2009-01-21 | (C) Draft On Hold   | |
2009-01-16 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable   | |
2009-01-16 | (C) Draft Request Received   |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/laws09/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=413&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HB&Z_ACTION=Find |