MT HB40 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-14 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-14 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allow Dissemination of Confidential Criminal Justice Info to Adjutant General
Title
Allow Dissemination of Confidential Criminal Justice Info to Adjutant General
Sponsors
Rep. Kim Abbott [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-31 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-13 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-13 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-14 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2017-02-14 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2017-02-08 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2017-02-07 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2017-02-07 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-02 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-02-02 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-02-01 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-01-31 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2017-01-31 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2017-01-31 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-01-30 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2017-01-30 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-01-26 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) State Administration |
2017-01-25 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) State Administration |
2017-01-23 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration |
2017-01-18 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2017-01-18 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-01-17 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2017-01-17 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-01-17 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-01-16 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-01-16 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-01-13 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) State Administration |
2017-01-13 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) State Administration |
2017-01-10 | House | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration |
2017-01-02 | House | (H) First Reading (H) State Administration |
2016-12-08 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2016-12-07 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2016-12-07 | House | (H) Introduced |
2016-12-05 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2016-11-15 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2016-11-12 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2016-11-10 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2016-11-10 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2016-11-10 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2016-11-03 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2016-10-27 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2016-10-27 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2016-10-24 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2016-10-13 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2016-09-09 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-04-29 | (C) Draft Request Received |