MT HB375 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - (H) Veto Override Failed in Legislature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - (H) Veto Override Failed in Legislature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reduce certain general fund transfers
Title
Reduce certain general fund transfers
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Cook [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-28 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Not Concurred (Y: 60 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Not Concurred (Y: 60 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-10 | (H) Veto Override Failed in Legislature | |
2011-05-11 | (H) Veto Override Vote Mail Poll in Progress | |
2011-05-06 | (H) Veto Override Vote Mail Poll Letter Being Prepared | |
2011-05-06 | (H) Vetoed by Governor | |
2011-04-29 | (H) Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-29 | (S) Signed by President | |
2011-04-29 | (H) Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-29 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Returned from Enrolling | |
2011-04-28 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Sent to Enrolling | |
2011-04-28 | (S) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2011-04-28 | (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-27 | (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2011-04-27 | (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2011-04-27 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-04-27 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-04-26 | (S) Free Conference Committee Report Received | |
2011-04-26 | (H) Free Conference Committee Report Received | |
2011-04-26 | (S) Hearing (S) Free Conference | |
2011-04-13 | (S) Free Conference Committee Appointed | |
2011-04-13 | (H) Free Conference Committee Appointed | |
2011-04-13 | (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Not Concurred | |
2011-04-13 | (S) Returned to House with Amendments | |
2011-04-13 | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred | |
2011-04-13 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-04-13 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-12 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2011-04-12 | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended | |
2011-04-12 | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-04-05 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2011-04-05 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Finance and Claims | |
2011-04-04 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Finance and Claims | |
2011-04-02 | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims | |
2011-03-31 | (S) Hearing Canceled (S) Finance and Claims | |
2011-03-30 | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed | |
2011-03-29 | (S) Hearing Canceled (S) Finance and Claims | |
2011-03-28 | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed | |
2011-03-28 | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received | |
2011-03-23 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims | |
2011-03-23 | (S) First Reading | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Transmitted to Senate | |
2011-03-23 | (H) 3rd Reading Passed | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-03-22 | (H) 2nd Reading Passed | |
2011-03-22 | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested | |
2011-03-22 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-16 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Appropriations | |
2011-03-15 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Appropriations | |
2011-03-15 | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Scheduled for Executive Action (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Long-Range Planning | |
2011-03-02 | (H) Scheduled for Executive Action (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Long-Range Planning | |
2011-02-21 | (H) Scheduled for Executive Action (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Long-Range Planning | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Fiscal Note Printed | |
2011-02-09 | (H) Fiscal Note Signed | |
2011-02-09 | (H) Fiscal Note Received | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Long-Range Planning | |
2011-02-07 | (H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Long-Range Planning | |
2011-02-07 | (H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Education | |
2011-02-04 | (H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Long-Range Planning | |
2011-02-04 | (H) Hearing (H) Joint Approps Subcom on Judicial Branch, Law Enforcement, and Justice | |
2011-02-04 | (H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Long-Range Planning | |
2011-02-04 | (H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government | |
2011-02-03 | (H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Long-Range Planning | |
2011-02-03 | (H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Natural Resources and Transportation | |
2011-01-31 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Appropriations | |
2011-01-31 | (H) First Reading | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Introduced | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Fiscal Note Requested | |
2011-01-28 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2011-01-27 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2011-01-27 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2011-01-27 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2011-01-26 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2011-01-26 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2011-01-26 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB] | |
2011-01-24 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2011-01-24 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2011-01-15 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2010-12-29 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2010-12-11 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2010-10-19 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2010-10-19 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2010-10-19 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Fish and Wildlife
Motor Vehicles
Professions and Occupations O-Z
Revenue, State
State Finance
University System
Motor Vehicles
Professions and Occupations O-Z
Revenue, State
State Finance
University System