MT HB34 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Increase net metering cap for certain customer generators

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increase net metering cap for certain customer generators

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28House(H) Died in Standing Committee
2017-03-01House(H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
2017-02-03House(H) Tabled in Committee (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations
2017-01-09House(H) Hearing (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations
2017-01-02House(H) First Reading (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations
2016-12-07House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations
2016-11-30 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2016-11-30House(H) Introduced
2016-11-10 (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
2016-11-09 (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
2016-11-07 (C) Draft in Assembly
2016-11-07 (C) Executive Director Review
2016-11-07 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2016-11-07 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2016-10-28 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2016-10-26 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
2016-10-25 (C) Draft in Edit
2016-10-12 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2016-10-12 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2016-09-13 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback