MT HB331 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Chapter Number Assigned  
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Chapter Number Assigned  
Summary
Revise laws relating to licensed establishments for health purposes
Title
Revise laws relating to licensed establishments for health purposes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Chapter Number Assigned   | |
2009-04-30 | (H) Transmitted to Governor   | |
2009-04-30 | (S) Signed by President   | |
2009-04-27 | (H) Signed by Speaker   | |
2009-04-27 | (H) Returned from Enrolling   | |
2009-04-27 | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed   | |
2009-04-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-04-24 | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received   | |
2009-04-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-04-23 | (H) Sent to Enrolling   | |
2009-04-23 | (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted   | |
2009-04-23 | (S) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted   | |
2009-04-23 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-04-23 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-04-22 | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested   | |
2009-04-22 | (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted   | |
2009-04-22 | (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference committee Report Adopted on Voice Vote   | |
2009-04-22 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-04-22 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-04-21 | (H) Free Conference Committee Report Received   | |
2009-04-21 | (S) Free Conference Committee Report Received   | |
2009-04-21 | (S) Hearing (S) Free Conference | |
2009-04-20 | (S) Free Conference Committee Appointed   | |
2009-04-18 | (H) Free Conference Committee Appointed   | |
2009-04-18 | (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Not Concurred   | |
2009-04-18 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-04-15 | (S) Returned to House with Amendments   | |
2009-04-15 | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred   | |
2009-04-15 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-04-14 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-04-14 | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended   | |
2009-04-14 | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried on Voice Vote   | |
2009-04-14 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-04-08 | (S) Taken from Committee; Placed on 2nd Reading (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs | |
2009-04-07 | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs | |
2009-04-07 | (S) Taken from Table in Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs | |
2009-03-27 | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs | |
2009-03-17 | (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs | |
2009-03-02 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs | |
2009-03-02 | (S) First Reading   | |
2009-02-25 | (H) Transmitted to Senate   | |
2009-02-25 | (H) 3rd Reading Passed   | |
2009-02-25 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-02-24 | (H) 2nd Reading Passed   | |
2009-02-24 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-02-23 | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed   | |
2009-02-23 | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed   | |
2009-02-23 | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received   | |
2009-02-19 | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested   | |
2009-02-18 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Local Government | |
2009-02-18 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-02-17 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Local Government | |
2009-02-05 | (H) Hearing (H) Local Government | |
2009-01-29 | (H) Fiscal Note Printed   | |
2009-01-29 | (H) Fiscal Note Signed   | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Fiscal Note Received   | |
2009-01-22 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically   | |
2009-01-22 | (H) First Reading   | |
2009-01-22 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Local Government | |
2009-01-22 | (H) Fiscal Note Requested   | |
2009-01-22 | (H) Introduced   | |
2009-01-20 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester   | |
2009-01-19 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery   | |
2009-01-15 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review   | |
2009-01-15 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review   | |
2009-01-15 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing   | |
2009-01-15 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]   | |
2009-01-15 | (C) Draft in Edit   | |
2009-01-15 | (C) Draft in Legal Review   | |
2009-01-15 | (C) Draft Back for Redo   | |
2009-01-07 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery   | |
2009-01-05 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable   | |
2009-01-05 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review   | |
2009-01-05 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review   | |
2009-01-05 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically   | |
2009-01-05 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing   | |
2009-01-05 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]   | |
2009-01-05 | (C) Draft in Edit   | |
2009-01-05 | (C) Draft in Legal Review   | |
2008-12-26 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review   | |
2008-12-26 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review   | |
2008-11-19 | (C) Draft Request Received   |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/laws09/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=331&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HB&Z_ACTION=Find |