MT HB330 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establish standards for law enforcement use and acquisition of certain equipment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish standards for law enforcement use and acquisition of certain equipment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-08 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate (Y: 79 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 89 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-28 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 60 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 88 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-23 Chapter Number Assigned
2015-04-23House(H) Signed by Governor
2015-04-13House(H) Transmitted to Governor
2015-04-13Senate(S) Signed by President
2015-04-13House(H) Signed by Speaker
2015-04-09House(H) Returned from Enrolling
2015-04-09 (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available
2015-04-08House(H) Sent to Enrolling
2015-04-08House(H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate
2015-04-08House(H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2015-04-07House(H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred
2015-04-07House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2015-03-31Senate(S) Returned to House with Amendments
2015-03-30Senate(S) 3rd Reading Concurred
2015-03-30Senate(S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2015-03-28Senate(S) 2nd Reading Concurred
2015-03-28Senate(S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2015-03-25Senate(S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Judiciary
2015-03-25Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Judiciary
2015-03-19Senate(S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Judiciary
2015-03-19Senate(S) Tabled in Committee (S) Finance and Claims
2015-03-17Senate(S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims
2015-03-13Senate(S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims
2015-03-13House(H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested
2015-03-12 (C) Printed - New Version Available
2015-03-12Senate(S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Judiciary
2015-03-12Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Judiciary
2015-03-11Senate(S) Hearing (S) Judiciary
2015-03-09House(H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed
2015-03-06House(H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed
2015-03-06Senate(S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary
2015-03-06Senate(S) First Reading
2015-03-05House(H) Revised Fiscal Note Received
2015-02-27House(H) Transmitted to Senate
2015-02-27House(H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested
2015-02-26House(H) 3rd Reading Passed
2015-02-26House(H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2015-02-25 (C) Printed - New Version Available
2015-02-25House(H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended
2015-02-25House(H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried
2015-02-25House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2015-02-24 (C) Printed - New Version Available
2015-02-24House(H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Appropriations
2015-02-23House(H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Appropriations
2015-02-23House(H) Taken from Table in Committee (H) Appropriations
2015-02-20House(H) Tabled in Committee (H) Appropriations
2015-02-20House(H) Hearing (H) Appropriations
2015-02-19House(H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed
2015-02-19House(H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed
2015-02-19House(H) Revised Fiscal Note Received
2015-02-18House(H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations
2015-02-18House(H) 2nd Reading Passed
2015-02-18House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2015-02-17House(H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested
2015-02-16 (C) Printed - New Version Available
2015-02-16House(H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Judiciary
2015-02-16House(H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Judiciary
2015-02-04House(H) Fiscal Note Printed
2015-02-04House(H) Hearing (H) Judiciary
2015-02-03House(H) Fiscal Note Signed
2015-02-03House(H) Fiscal Note Received
2015-01-28 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2015-01-28House(H) First Reading
2015-01-28House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary
2015-01-28House(H) Fiscal Note Requested
2015-01-28House(H) Introduced
2015-01-27 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2015-01-23 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2015-01-22 (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
2015-01-22 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2015-01-22 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2015-01-22 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2015-01-21 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
2015-01-20 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2015-01-20 (C) Fiscal Note Probable
2015-01-19 (C) Draft On Hold
2015-01-14 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2014-11-06 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=330&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20151
Texthttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2015/hb0399/HB0330_1.pdf
Texthttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2015/hb0399/HB0330_2.pdf
Texthttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2015/hb0399/HB0330_3.pdf
Texthttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2015/hb0399/HB0330_4.pdf
Texthttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2015/hb0399/HB0330_5.pdf
Texthttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2015/hb0399/HB0330_x.pdf
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H603&P_SESS=20151
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H779&P_SESS=20151
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H828&P_SESS=20151
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S1264&P_SESS=20151
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S1324&P_SESS=20151
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H1456&P_SESS=20151
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H1492&P_SESS=20151
Roll Callhttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2015/minutes/house/votesheets/HB0330JUH150216.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2015/minutes/house/votesheets/HB0330APH150223.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2015/minutes/senate/votesheets/HB0330JUS150312.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2015/minutes/senate/votesheets/HB0330JUS150325.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback