MT HB296 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revise when ballots may be prepared for counting
Title
Revise when ballots may be prepared for counting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concur Motion Failed (Y: 22 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-06 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 83 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concur Motion Failed (Y: 22 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-06 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 83 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Senate | (S) Died in Process |
2013-03-18 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed |
2013-03-18 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concur Motion Failed |
2013-03-18 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-03-14 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-03-14 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) State Administration |
2013-03-13 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) State Administration |
2013-03-06 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration |
2013-02-20 | Senate | (S) Hearing Canceled (S) State Administration |
2013-02-11 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2013-02-11 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-02-07 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2013-02-06 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-02-06 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-02-05 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-02-05 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-02-01 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) State Administration |
2013-02-01 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) State Administration |
2013-01-28 | House | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration |
2013-01-25 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-01-25 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2013-01-25 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-24 | House | (H) Introduced |
2013-01-24 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-01-23 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-01-23 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-01-23 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-01-23 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-23 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-01-22 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2013-01-22 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2012-12-27 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2012-12-19 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-10-15 | (C) Draft Request Received |