MT HB290 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide that jury may judge facts and application of law to the facts
Title
Provide that jury may judge facts and application of law to the facts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-09 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Not Passed (Y: 38 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | House | (H) Died in Process |
2013-02-28 | House | (H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2013-02-09 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Not Passed |
2013-02-09 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-02-06 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Judiciary |
2013-02-06 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Judiciary |
2013-01-30 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2013-01-26 | (C) Legal Review Note | |
2013-01-24 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-01-24 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2013-01-24 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-23 | House | (H) Introduced |
2013-01-23 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-01-18 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-01-18 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-01-17 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-01-17 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-17 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-01-16 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2013-01-09 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2012-12-31 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-12-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |