MT HB29 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require parcel to be at least 1 acre for valuation as agricultural property
Title
Require parcel to be at least 1 acre for valuation as agricultural property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-25 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-13 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-13 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Taxation |
2017-04-12 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Taxation |
2017-02-02 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation |
2017-01-26 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2017-01-26 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-01-25 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2017-01-25 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-01-25 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-01-24 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed |
2017-01-24 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-01-16 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Pass Consideration |
2017-01-16 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-01-13 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Taxation |
2017-01-13 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Taxation |
2017-01-10 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2017-01-04 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-01-03 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2017-01-02 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2017-01-02 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Taxation |
2016-12-07 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2016-12-01 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2016-11-30 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2016-11-30 | House | (H) Introduced |
2016-11-09 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2016-11-09 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2016-11-07 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2016-11-07 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2016-11-07 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2016-11-07 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2016-11-07 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2016-11-07 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2016-10-21 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2016-10-21 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2016-10-18 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2016-10-17 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2016-10-17 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-10-17 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2016-09-08 | (C) Draft Request Received |