MT HB274 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee  
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee  
Summary
Allow travel reimbursement for poet laureate at same rates as state employees
Title
Allow travel reimbursement for poet laureate at same rates as state employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-28 | (S) Died in Standing Committee   | |
2009-04-17 | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Finance and Claims | |
2009-03-20 | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims | |
2009-02-23 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims | |
2009-02-23 | (S) First Reading   | |
2009-02-14 | (H) Transmitted to Senate   | |
2009-02-14 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-02-13 | (H) 3rd Reading Passed   | |
2009-02-13 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-02-12 | (H) 2nd Reading Passed   | |
2009-02-12 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-02-06 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) State Administration | |
2009-02-06 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) State Administration | |
2009-01-29 | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Fiscal Note Printed   | |
2009-01-22 | (H) Fiscal Note Signed   | |
2009-01-22 | (H) Fiscal Note Received   | |
2009-01-16 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically   | |
2009-01-16 | (H) First Reading   | |
2009-01-16 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration | |
2009-01-16 | (H) Introduced   | |
2009-01-16 | (H) Fiscal Note Requested   | |
2009-01-14 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester   | |
2009-01-13 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery   | |
2009-01-12 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review   | |
2009-01-12 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review   | |
2009-01-12 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically   | |
2009-01-12 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing   | |
2009-01-12 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]   | |
2009-01-12 | (C) Draft in Edit   | |
2009-01-09 | (C) Draft in Legal Review   | |
2009-01-09 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review   | |
2009-01-09 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable   | |
2009-01-09 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold   | |
2008-12-09 | (C) Draft On Hold   | |
2008-11-14 | (C) Draft Request Received   |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/laws09/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=274&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HB&Z_ACTION=Find |