MT HB271 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise county road adoption procedure re: subdivision plats
Title
Revise county road adoption procedure re: subdivision plats
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - (S) Highways and Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - (H) Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - (S) Highways and Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - (H) Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2021-03-31 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2021-03-26 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2021-03-26 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2021-03-26 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-23 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2021-03-23 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2021-03-19 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2021-03-18 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2021-03-18 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2021-03-18 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-03-17 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2021-03-17 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-03-12 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Highways and Transportation |
2021-03-11 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Highways and Transportation |
2021-03-09 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Highways and Transportation |
2021-02-18 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Highways and Transportation |
2021-02-18 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2021-02-17 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-02-17 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-02-15 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2021-02-15 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended |
2021-02-15 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2021-02-15 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2021-02-15 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-02-12 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-02-11 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Transportation |
2021-02-10 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Transportation |
2021-02-08 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Transportation |
2021-01-29 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-01-29 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Transportation |
2021-01-28 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-01-28 | House | (H) Introduced |
2021-01-28 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-01-27 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-01-27 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-01-27 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-01-27 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-01-27 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-01-27 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-01-27 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-01-27 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-01-27 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-01-23 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-01-22 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2021-01-22 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-12-22 | (C) Draft Request Received |