MT HB271 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An act establishing the honor and remember medallion for military service
Title
An act establishing the honor and remember medallion for military service
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Cook [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 84 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 84 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2017-03-27 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2017-03-22 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-21 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2017-03-20 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-20 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-03-20 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-03-16 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-03-15 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2017-03-15 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-03-14 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2017-03-14 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-03-10 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) State Administration |
2017-03-10 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) State Administration |
2017-02-18 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-02-17 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2017-02-16 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2017-02-15 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration |
2017-02-15 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2017-02-13 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-02-09 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2017-02-08 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-02-08 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-02-07 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-02-07 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-02-03 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-02-03 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) State Administration |
2017-02-03 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) State Administration |
2017-01-26 | House | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration |
2017-01-18 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-18 | House | (H) First Reading (H) State Administration |
2017-01-18 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2017-01-17 | House | (H) Introduced |
2017-01-16 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-01-12 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-01-12 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-01-12 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2017-01-12 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2017-01-12 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-12 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-01-11 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2017-01-11 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2017-01-10 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2017-01-09 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2016-12-21 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-12-21 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-10-03 | (C) Draft Request Received |