MT HB229 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allowing worker to choose treating physician in workers'' compensation cases

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing worker to choose treating physician in workers'' compensation cases

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28House(H) Died in Standing Committee
2017-03-01House(H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
2017-02-24House(H) Motion Failed
2017-02-09House(H) Tabled in Committee (H) Business and Labor
2017-01-27House(H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor
2017-01-20House(H) Fiscal Note Printed
2017-01-19House(H) Fiscal Note Signed
2017-01-19House(H) Fiscal Note Received
2017-01-16House(H) Hearing Canceled (H) Business and Labor
2017-01-12House(H) First Reading (H) Business and Labor
2017-01-12House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor
2017-01-11 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2017-01-11House(H) Fiscal Note Requested
2017-01-11House(H) Introduced
2017-01-09 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2017-01-09 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2017-01-06 (C) Executive Director Final Review
2017-01-06 (C) Draft in Assembly
2017-01-06 (C) Executive Director Review
2017-01-06 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2017-01-06 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2017-01-05 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2017-01-05 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
2017-01-05 (C) Draft in Edit
2017-01-04 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2016-12-30 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2016-12-20 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2016-12-20 (C) Fiscal Note Probable
2016-12-01 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback