MT HB229 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Highways and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Generally revise laws related to temporary road blocks

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Generally revise laws related to temporary road blocks

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-09 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 85 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-07 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 84 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - (H) Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28Senate(S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Highways and Transportation
2015-02-17Senate(S) Tabled in Committee (S) Highways and Transportation
2015-02-17Senate(S) Hearing (S) Highways and Transportation
2015-02-11Senate(S) Referred to Committee (S) Highways and Transportation
2015-02-11Senate(S) First Reading
2015-02-10House(H) Transmitted to Senate
2015-02-09House(H) 3rd Reading Passed
2015-02-09House(H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2015-02-07House(H) 2nd Reading Passed
2015-02-07House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2015-02-05 (C) Printed - New Version Available
2015-02-05House(H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Transportation
2015-02-04House(H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Transportation
2015-01-21House(H) Hearing (H) Transportation
2015-01-15 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2015-01-15House(H) First Reading
2015-01-15House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Transportation
2015-01-15House(H) Introduced
2015-01-13 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2015-01-08 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2015-01-07 (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
2015-01-07 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2015-01-06 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2015-01-06 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2015-01-06 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
2015-01-05 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2014-12-31 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2014-12-08 (C) Draft On Hold
2014-12-05 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback