MT HB228 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revise hunting privileges for youths
Title
Revise hunting privileges for youths
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-21 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Not Passed (Y: 45 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-17 - House - (H) Reconsidered Previous Action; Placed on 2nd Reading (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Not Passed (Y: 50 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-17 - House - (H) Reconsidered Previous Action; Placed on 2nd Reading (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Not Passed (Y: 50 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | (H) Died in Process | |
2011-03-30 | (H) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal | |
2011-02-21 | (H) 2nd Reading Not Passed | |
2011-02-21 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-17 | (H) Reconsidered Previous Action; Placed on 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-17 | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed | |
2011-02-16 | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed | |
2011-02-16 | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received | |
2011-02-16 | (H) 2nd Reading Not Passed | |
2011-02-16 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested | |
2011-02-11 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Taken from Table in Committee (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks | |
2011-01-27 | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Scheduled for Executive Action (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Hearing (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks | |
2011-01-18 | (H) Fiscal Note Printed | |
2011-01-18 | (H) Fiscal Note Signed | |
2011-01-18 | (H) Fiscal Note Received | |
2011-01-12 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks | |
2011-01-12 | (H) First Reading | |
2011-01-11 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2011-01-11 | (H) Fiscal Note Requested | |
2011-01-11 | (H) Introduced | |
2011-01-10 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2011-01-03 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2010-12-22 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2010-12-22 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2010-12-20 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2010-12-20 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2010-12-20 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2010-12-20 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2010-12-15 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2010-12-15 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2010-12-08 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2010-11-23 | (C) Draft Request Received |