MT HB209 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Extend funding to Coal Board
Title
Extend funding to Coal Board
Sponsors
Sen. Barry Usher [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 79 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-25 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 69 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-25 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 69 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2017-05-11 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2017-05-04 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2017-05-04 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2017-04-27 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-27 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-04-26 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-04-25 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-04-25 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-04-25 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted |
2017-04-25 | Senate | (S) Returned to House Concurred in Governor's Proposed Amendments |
2017-04-25 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted |
2017-04-25 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-04-24 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted |
2017-04-24 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-04-24 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted |
2017-04-24 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-04-07 | House | (H) Returned with Governor's Proposed Amendments |
2017-03-29 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-29 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2017-03-28 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-28 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-03-28 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-03-27 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-03-25 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2017-03-25 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2017-03-25 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-03-24 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2017-03-24 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-03-21 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-03-21 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-03-14 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-03-09 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-03-09 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Taxation |
2017-03-09 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Taxation |
2017-02-17 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation |
2017-02-13 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2017-02-13 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2017-02-10 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-02-10 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2017-02-08 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2017-02-03 | House | (H) Sponsor List Modified |
2017-02-02 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2017-01-30 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2017-01-30 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-01-30 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-01-27 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-01-27 | (C) Sponsors Engrossed | |
2017-01-27 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Taxation |
2017-01-27 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Taxation |
2017-01-19 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2017-01-17 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-01-17 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2017-01-16 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2017-01-10 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Taxation |
2017-01-10 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2017-01-09 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-09 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-01-09 | House | (H) Introduced |
2017-01-04 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-01-04 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-01-04 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-01-03 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2017-01-03 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2017-01-03 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-03 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-01-03 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-03 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-01-03 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2016-12-30 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2016-12-30 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2016-12-29 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2016-12-16 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-12-16 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2016-12-15 | (C) Draft Request Received |