MT HB2 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-18 - (H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Natural Resources and Transportation
Pending: Joint Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Natural Resources and Transportation Committee
Hearing: Jan 17 @ 8:45 am in Room 472
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

General Appropriations Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Appropriations Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-18House(H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Natural Resources and Transportation
2019-01-18House(H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
2019-01-17House(H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
2019-01-17House(H) Hearing (H) Joint Approps Subcom on Judicial Branch, Law Enforcement, and Justice
2019-01-17House(H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
2019-01-16House(H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
2019-01-16House(H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Natural Resources and Transportation
2019-01-16House(H) Hearing (H) Joint Approps Subcom on Judicial Branch, Law Enforcement, and Justice
2019-01-16House(H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
2019-01-15House(H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
2019-01-15House(H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Natural Resources and Transportation
2019-01-15House(H) Hearing (H) Joint Approps Subcom on Judicial Branch, Law Enforcement, and Justice
2019-01-15House(H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2019-01-15House(H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
2019-01-14House(H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
2019-01-14House(H) Scheduled for Executive Action (H) Joint Approps Subcom on Judicial Branch, Law Enforcement, and Justice
2019-01-14House(H) Scheduled for Executive Action (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Natural Resources and Transportation
2019-01-14House(H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
2019-01-11House(H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
2019-01-07House(H) First Reading (H) Appropriations
2018-12-16House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Appropriations
2018-12-13 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2018-12-13House(H) Introduced
2018-12-11 (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
2018-12-11 (C) Draft in Assembly
2018-12-11 (C) Executive Director Review
2018-12-11 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2018-12-11 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2018-12-11 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2018-12-11 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
2018-12-11 (C) Draft in Edit
2018-12-11 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2018-12-11 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2018-08-24 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback