MT HB186 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Education and Cultural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Education and Cultural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise laws related to teacher certification
Title
Generally revise laws related to teacher certification
Sponsors
Rep. Scot Kerns [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 69 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 69 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2021-03-22 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2021-03-15 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2021-02-24 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2021-02-24 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-02-23 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2021-02-23 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-02-23 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-02-22 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-02-22 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-02-18 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2021-02-18 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Education |
2021-02-17 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Education |
2021-02-17 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-02-03 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Education |
2021-01-21 | (C) Legal Review Note | |
2021-01-19 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-01-19 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-01-19 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Education |
2021-01-19 | House | (H) Introduced |
2021-01-19 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-01-18 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-01-18 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-01-18 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-01-18 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-01-18 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-01-18 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-01-18 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-01-15 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2020-12-28 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2020-12-28 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2020-12-24 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2020-12-24 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-12-13 | (C) Draft Request Received |