MT HB176 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increase amount of oil and nat. gas prod. taxes retained by school district
Title
Increase amount of oil and nat. gas prod. taxes retained by school district
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-07 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Appropriations |
2013-04-05 | House | (H) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal |
2013-04-02 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Appropriations |
2013-03-27 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2013-02-07 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2013-02-07 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-02-07 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-02-02 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Education |
2013-02-01 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Education |
2013-01-23 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-01-23 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2013-01-21 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Education |
2013-01-21 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-01-17 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2013-01-10 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-01-10 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Education |
2013-01-09 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-09 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-01-09 | House | (H) Introduced |
2013-01-07 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2012-12-21 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2012-11-29 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2012-11-29 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2012-11-29 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2012-11-29 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2012-11-28 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2012-11-28 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2012-11-28 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2012-11-28 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2012-11-28 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-11-28 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-11-04 | (C) Draft Request Received |