MT HB17 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-10 - (H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-10 - (H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for implementation of certified community behavioral health clinic model
Title
Provide for implementation of certified community behavioral health clinic model
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Stafman [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-09 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 60 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - (H) Human Services Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - (H) Human Services Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | House | (H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2023-02-15 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Appropriations |
2023-02-14 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-02-13 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2023-02-13 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2023-02-10 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2023-02-09 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2023-02-09 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2023-02-09 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-02-06 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2023-02-03 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2023-02-03 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Human Services |
2023-02-02 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Human Services |
2023-02-01 | House | (H) Sponsor List Modified |
2023-01-17 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Human Services |
2023-01-17 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2023-01-09 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-01-06 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Unsigned |
2023-01-04 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2023-01-02 | House | (H) First Reading |
2022-12-19 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Human Services |
2022-11-30 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2022-11-30 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2022-11-28 | House | (H) Introduced |
2022-11-28 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2022-11-14 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2022-11-14 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2022-11-09 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2022-11-09 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2022-09-21 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2022-09-20 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2022-09-14 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2022-09-07 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2022-09-07 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2022-08-31 | (C) Draft Request Received |