MT HB17 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increase HCBS waiver slots and assisted living reimbursement rates
Title
Increase HCBS waiver slots and assisted living reimbursement rates
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Ehli [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - (H) Human Services Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - (H) Human Services Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2017-05-03 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2017-05-01 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-29 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2017-04-26 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-20 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-04-20 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-04-20 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-04-19 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2017-04-19 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-19 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-19 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-04-19 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-04-19 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-03-14 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-03-09 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-03-09 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-03-08 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2017-03-08 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-03-08 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-03-07 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-02-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-02-24 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2017-02-23 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2017-02-23 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2017-02-22 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2017-02-22 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-02-22 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-02-21 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Human Services |
2017-02-20 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Human Services |
2017-02-20 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Human Services |
2017-01-02 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Human Services |
2016-12-07 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Human Services |
2016-11-23 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2016-11-23 | House | (H) Introduced |
2016-11-09 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2016-11-07 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2016-11-07 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2016-11-07 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2016-11-07 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2016-11-07 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2016-11-07 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2016-11-07 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2016-11-07 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2016-10-31 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2016-10-24 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2016-10-19 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2016-10-14 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2016-10-12 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2016-10-05 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-09-02 | (C) Draft Request Received |