MT HB161 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establish requirements for fish and wildlife decisionmaking processes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish requirements for fish and wildlife decisionmaking processes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25House(H) Died in Process
2019-03-01House(H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
2019-02-12House(H) Tabled in Committee (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks
2019-01-22House(H) Hearing (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks
2019-01-10 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2019-01-10House(H) First Reading (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks
2019-01-10House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks
2019-01-10House(H) Introduced
2019-01-09 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2019-01-08 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2019-01-08 (C) Executive Director Final Review
2019-01-08 (C) Draft in Assembly
2019-01-08 (C) Executive Director Review
2019-01-07 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2019-01-07 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2019-01-05 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2019-01-04 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
2019-01-03 (C) Draft in Edit
2019-01-02 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2019-01-02 (C) Draft On Hold
2018-12-18 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2018-12-04 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback