MT HB157 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Removing restrictions on possession of domestically-bred foxes
Title
Removing restrictions on possession of domestically-bred foxes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-18 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - (H) Agriculture Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 12 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - (H) Agriculture Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 12 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2017-03-14 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2017-03-07 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2017-02-21 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2017-02-21 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-02-18 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2017-02-18 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-02-18 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-02-17 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-02-17 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-02-15 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-02-15 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Agriculture |
2017-02-14 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Agriculture |
2017-02-14 | House | (H) Taken from Table in Committee (H) Agriculture |
2017-01-17 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Agriculture |
2017-01-12 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Agriculture |
2017-01-04 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-04 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Agriculture |
2017-01-04 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Agriculture |
2017-01-04 | House | (H) Introduced |
2017-01-03 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2016-12-19 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2016-12-16 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2016-12-12 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2016-12-10 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2016-12-09 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2016-12-09 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2016-12-06 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2016-12-05 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2016-11-25 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2016-11-18 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2016-11-18 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-11-15 | (C) Draft Request Received |