MT HB13 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-06 - (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

State Employee Pay Plan

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Employee Pay Plan

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-06House(H) Hearing (H) Appropriations
2021-01-06House(H) Fiscal Note Printed
2021-01-06House(H) Fiscal Note Signed
2021-01-05House(H) Fiscal Note Received
2021-01-04 (C) Amendments Available
2021-01-04House(H) First Reading (H) Appropriations
2020-12-24House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Appropriations
2020-12-23House(H) Fiscal Note Requested
2020-12-14House(H) Introduced
2020-12-14 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2020-12-08 (C) Draft in Assembly
2020-12-08 (C) Executive Director Review
2020-12-07 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2020-12-07 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2020-12-04 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2020-12-04 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
2020-11-21 (C) Draft in Edit
2020-11-19 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2020-09-18 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback