MT HB126 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-30 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Amend youth court act to clarify sentencing authority

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amend youth court act to clarify sentencing authority

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-16 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-22 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-30 Chapter Number Assigned
2011-03-30 (H) Signed by Governor
2011-03-22 (H) Transmitted to Governor
2011-03-22 (S) Signed by President
2011-03-21 (H) Signed by Speaker
2011-03-17 (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available
2011-03-17 (H) Returned from Enrolling
2011-03-16 (H) Sent to Enrolling
2011-03-16 (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate
2011-03-16 (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2011-03-15 (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred
2011-03-15 (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2011-03-10 (S) Returned to House with Amendments
2011-03-10 (S) 3rd Reading Concurred
2011-03-10 (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2011-03-09 (S) 2nd Reading Concurred
2011-03-09 (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2011-03-07 (C) Printed - New Version Available
2011-03-07 (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Judiciary
2011-03-07 (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Judiciary
2011-03-07 (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary
2011-02-04 (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary
2011-02-04 (S) First Reading
2011-01-24 (H) Transmitted to Senate
2011-01-24 (H) 3rd Reading Passed
2011-01-24 (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2011-01-22 (H) 2nd Reading Passed
2011-01-22 (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2011-01-21 (C) Printed - New Version Available
2011-01-21 (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Judiciary
2011-01-20 (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Judiciary
2011-01-12 (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary
2011-01-03 (H) First Reading
2010-12-22 (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary
2010-12-15 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2010-12-15 (H) Introduced
2010-12-10 (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
2010-12-01 (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
2010-12-01 (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
2010-12-01 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2010-11-30 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2010-11-30 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2010-11-30 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]
2010-11-24 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2010-11-16 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2010-11-16 (C) Draft Taken Off Hold
2010-09-16 (C) Draft On Hold
2010-09-14 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/laws11/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=126&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HB&Z_ACTION=Find
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2011/hb0199/HB0126_1.pdf
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2011/hb0199/HB0126_2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2011/hb0199/HB0126_3.pdf
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2011/hb0199/HB0126_x.pdf
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/laws11/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H108
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/laws11/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H129
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/laws11/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S723
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/laws11/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S756
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/laws11/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H987
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/laws11/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H1007

Bill Comments 750

feedback