MT HB112 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Require interscholastic athletes to participate under sex assigned at birth

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require interscholastic athletes to participate under sex assigned at birth

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-23 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 60 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 60 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Not Concurred (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 61 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 67 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 62 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-07 Chapter Number Assigned
2021-05-07House(H) Signed by Governor
2021-05-04House(H) Transmitted to Governor
2021-05-04Senate(S) Signed by President
2021-05-04House(H) Signed by Speaker
2021-04-27 (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available
2021-04-27House(H) Returned from Enrolling
2021-04-23House(H) Sent to Enrolling
2021-04-23Senate(S) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted
2021-04-23Senate(S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2021-04-23House(H) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted
2021-04-23House(H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2021-04-22Senate(S) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted
2021-04-22House(H) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted
2021-04-22Senate(S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2021-04-22House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2021-04-21Senate(S) Conference Committee Report Received (S) Conference
2021-04-20Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Conference
2021-04-20House(H) Conference Committee Report Received (S) Conference
2021-04-20Senate(S) Hearing (S) Conference
2021-04-14Senate(S) Conference Committee Appointed (S) Conference
2021-04-13House(H) Conference Committee Appointed (S) Conference
2021-04-12House(H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Not Concurred
2021-04-12House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2021-04-01Senate(S) Returned to House with Amendments
2021-04-01Senate(S) 3rd Reading Concurred
2021-04-01Senate(S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2021-03-30 (C) Printed - New Version Available
2021-03-30Senate(S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended
2021-03-30Senate(S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried
2021-03-30Senate(S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2021-03-18Senate(S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Judiciary
2021-03-18Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Judiciary
2021-03-17Senate(S) Hearing (S) Judiciary
2021-02-17Senate(S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary
2021-02-03House(H) Fiscal Note Printed
2021-02-03House(H) Fiscal Note Signed
2021-02-03House(H) Fiscal Note Received
2021-01-28Senate(S) First Reading
2021-01-27House(H) Transmitted to Senate
2021-01-27House(H) 3rd Reading Passed
2021-01-27House(H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2021-01-25House(H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended
2021-01-25House(H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried
2021-01-25House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2021-01-22House(H) Fiscal Note Requested
2021-01-21House(H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Judiciary
2021-01-21House(H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Judiciary
2021-01-18House(H) Hearing (H) Judiciary
2021-01-11House(H) Hearing Canceled (H) Judiciary
2021-01-09 (C) Amendments Available
2021-01-06House(H) First Reading (H) Judiciary
2021-01-06House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary
2021-01-05 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2021-01-05House(H) Introduced
2020-12-31 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2020-12-30 (C) Executive Director Final Review
2020-12-30 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2020-12-24 (C) Draft in Assembly
2020-12-24 (C) Executive Director Review
2020-12-23 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2020-12-23 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2020-12-22 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2020-12-22 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
2020-12-16 (C) Draft in Edit
2020-12-15 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2020-12-03 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2020-11-25 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2020-08-05 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=112&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20211
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2021/HB0199/HB0112_1.pdf
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2021/HB0199/HB0112_2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2021/HB0199/HB0112_3.pdf
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2021/HB0199/HB0112_4.pdf
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2021/HB0199/HB0112_X.pdf
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2021/HB0199/HB0112_5.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2021/FNPDF/HB0112_1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2021/minutes/house/votesheets/HB0112JUH210121.pdf
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H141&P_SESS=20211
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H188&P_SESS=20211
Roll Callhttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2021/minutes/senate/votesheets/HB0112JUS210318.pdf
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S1281&P_SESS=20211
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S1343&P_SESS=20211
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H1825&P_SESS=20211
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S1777&P_SESS=20211
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H1873&P_SESS=20211
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S1829&P_SESS=20211
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H140&P_SESS=20211
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S1280&P_SESS=20211
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H1578&P_SESS=20211

Bill Comments

feedback