MT HB102 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Generally revise gun laws

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Generally revise gun laws

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate (Y: 68 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 79 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - House - (H) Motion Carried (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-18 Chapter Number Assigned
2021-02-18House(H) Signed by Governor
2021-02-11House(H) Transmitted to Governor
2021-02-11Senate(S) Signed by President
2021-02-10House(H) Signed by Speaker
2021-02-09 (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available
2021-02-09House(H) Returned from Enrolling
2021-02-05House(H) Sent to Enrolling
2021-02-05House(H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate
2021-02-05House(H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2021-02-04House(H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred
2021-02-04House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2021-02-03Senate(S) Returned to House with Amendments
2021-02-03Senate(S) 3rd Reading Concurred
2021-02-03Senate(S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2021-02-02Senate(S) 2nd Reading Concurred
2021-02-02Senate(S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2021-01-29Senate(S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Judiciary
2021-01-29Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Judiciary
2021-01-27Senate(S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Judiciary
2021-01-26Senate(S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Judiciary
2021-01-26Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Judiciary
2021-01-20Senate(S) Hearing (S) Judiciary
2021-01-15Senate(S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary
2021-01-15Senate(S) First Reading
2021-01-14House(H) Transmitted to Senate
2021-01-14House(H) 3rd Reading Passed
2021-01-14House(H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2021-01-13House(H) 2nd Reading Passed
2021-01-13House(H) Motion Carried
2021-01-13House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2021-01-12House(H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Judiciary
2021-01-11House(H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Judiciary
2021-01-10 (C) Amendments Available
2021-01-08House(H) Sponsor List Modified (H) Judiciary
2021-01-07House(H) Sponsor List Modified (H) Judiciary
2021-01-06House(H) Sponsor List Modified (H) Judiciary
2021-01-06House(H) Hearing (H) Judiciary
2021-01-05 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2021-01-05 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2021-01-05House(H) Sponsor List Modified (H) Judiciary
2021-01-04House(H) First Reading (H) Judiciary
2021-01-02House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary
2020-12-31 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2020-12-31House(H) Introduced
2020-12-31 (C) Draft in Assembly
2020-12-31 (C) Executive Director Review
2020-12-31 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2020-12-31 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2020-12-31 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2020-12-30 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
2020-12-30 (C) Draft in Edit
2020-12-30 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2020-11-27 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=102&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20211
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2021/HB0199/HB0102_1.pdf
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2021/HB0199/HB0102_2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2021/HB0199/HB0102_3.pdf
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2021/HB0199/HB0102_4.pdf
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2021/HB0199/HB0102_X.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2021/minutes/house/votesheets/HB0102JUH210111.pdf
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H37&P_SESS=20211
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H45&P_SESS=20211
Roll Callhttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2021/minutes/senate/votesheets/HB0102JUS210126.pdf
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S204&P_SESS=20211
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S223&P_SESS=20211
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H281&P_SESS=20211
Roll Callhttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2021/minutes/senate/votesheets/HB0102JUS210129.pdf
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H319&P_SESS=20211
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H35&P_SESS=20211

Bill Comments

feedback