MT HB1 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-14 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-14 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Feed Bill
Title
Feed Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-20 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-10 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-09 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 92 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-05 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-10 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-09 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 92 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-05 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-14 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2017-02-03 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2017-02-03 | Senate | (S) Returned to House Not Concurred in Governor's Proposed Amendments |
2017-02-03 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Not Adopted |
2017-02-03 | Senate | (S) Motion Carried |
2017-02-03 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate for Consideration of Governor's Proposed Amendments |
2017-02-03 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Not Adopted |
2017-02-03 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-02-02 | House | (H) Returned with Governor's Proposed Amendments |
2017-01-25 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2017-01-24 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2017-01-24 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-01-23 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-01-23 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-01-20 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-01-20 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2017-01-20 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2017-01-20 | Senate | (S) On Motion Rules Suspended |
2017-01-20 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2017-01-20 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed |
2017-01-20 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-01-18 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-01-17 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-01-12 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-01-11 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-01-11 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-01-11 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-01-10 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2017-01-10 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-01-10 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-01-09 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-01-09 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-01-06 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2017-01-05 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2017-01-04 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2017-01-02 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Appropriations |
2016-12-19 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2016-12-09 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2016-12-09 | House | (H) Introduced |
2016-12-08 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2016-12-08 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2016-12-08 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2016-12-08 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2016-12-08 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2016-12-08 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2016-12-08 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2016-12-08 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2016-12-08 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2016-12-06 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-09-02 | (C) Draft Request Received |