MS SC692 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-07 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-07 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution To Authorize The Lieutenant Governor And The Speaker Of The House Of Representatives To Reconvene The Senate And The House On Or Before April 11, 2011.
Title
Legislature; authorize Lt. Governor and Speaker to reconvene the Legislature prior to sine die.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - House Adopted As Amended (Y: 63 N: 53 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Senate - Senate Failed (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Senate - Senate Failed (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-07 | Died On Calendar | |
2011-04-07 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2011-04-07 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | |
2011-04-06 | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Snowden, Warren, Clark, Wooten) | |
2011-04-06 | Adopted As Amended | |
2011-04-06 | Amended | |
2011-04-06 | Point of Order-Not Well Taken | |
2011-04-06 | Point of Order Raised | |
2011-04-05 | Failed to Suspend Rules | |
2011-04-05 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-04-05 | Referred To Rules | |
2011-04-05 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-04-05 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | |
2011-04-04 | Motion to Reconsider Entered | |
2011-04-04 | Adopted | |
2011-04-04 | Reconsidered | |
2011-04-04 | Failed | |
2011-04-04 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-04-04 | Referred To Rules |