MS SC691 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The H.w. Byers High School "lady Lions" Girls Basketball Team And Coach Jason Thompson For Winning The Mhsaa Class 1a State Championship.
Title
Commend H.W. Byers High School "Lady Lions" Basketball Team for winning the Class 1A State Championship.
Sponsors
Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Doug Davis [R] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] |
Sen. Bill Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-04-07 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-04-06 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-04-06 | Immediate Release | |
2011-04-06 | Adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-04-05 | Referred To Rules | |
2011-04-05 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-04-05 | Immediate Release | |
2011-04-05 | Adopted | |
2011-03-31 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-03-31 | Referred To Rules |